Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110036176B | Global Dossier | 26.10.2021 | B | CN110036176 | 19.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017SE51073 | 31.10.2017 | SE1651565 | 29.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3043152 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017SE51073 | 31.10.2017 | SE1651565 | 29.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017366970B | Global Dossier | 13.04.2023 | B2 | AU2017366970 | 30.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017SE51073 | 31.10.2017 | SE1651565 | 29.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3548691 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | C0 | EP3548691 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | B1 | EP3548691 | 30.09.2020 | A4 | EP3548691 | 09.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017SE51073 | 31.10.2017 | SE1651565 | 29.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2750372 | 28.06.2021 | C2 | RU2019120025 | 19.02.2021 | A3 | RU2019120025 | 11.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017SE51073 | 31.10.2017 | SE1651565 | 29.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201902985 | 20.12.2023 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2017SE51073 | 31.10.2017 | SE1651565 | 29.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018101870 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1651565 | 29.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2019001291 | 05.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1651565 | 29.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE541693 | 26.11.2019 | C2 | SE1651565 | 30.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1651565 | 29.11.2016 |