EP3548691 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND HOLDER FOR MOUNTING OF A DRILL BIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 04.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Epiroc Rock Drills Aktiebolag 701 91 Örebro / SE | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGBLOM, Johan Skärmarboda 304 713 91 Nora / SE | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Epiroc Rock Drills AB Patents 701 91 Örebro / SE | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 17875615.1 | 31.10.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017SE51073 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 04.07.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/32] | 11.07.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2023/32] | 11.07.2023 | Date of registration [2023/32] | 07.06.2023 | Date of legal effect [2023/32] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 11.07.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2023/32] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3548691 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 07 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee 07 | 31.10.2023 | M06 Fee paid on 30.11.2023 |