EP3552325 - LIQUID CRYSTAL BEAM CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LensVector Inc. 6203 San Ignacio Avenue San José, CA 95119 / US | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALSTIAN, Tigran 1007 Avenue Myrand Quebec, Québec G1V 2W1 / CA | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | IPAZ Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint-Aubin 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17877883.3 | 06.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017CA51476 | Priority number, date | US201662430616P | 06.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662430616 P | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018102922 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3552325 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, G02F1/29, H04B10/116, H04B10/40, H04B10/114 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
H04B10/116 (EP);
G02F1/29 (EP,US);
F21K9/233 (EP,US);
F21K9/65 (EP,US);
F21V14/003 (EP,US);
F21V23/045 (EP,US);
G02F1/1313 (EP);
G02F1/13306 (EP,US);
H04B10/11 (US);
H04B10/1149 (EP);
H04B10/50 (US);
H04B10/60 (US);
F21S8/033 (EP);
F21S8/04 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
G02F2203/24 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/42] | H04B10/516, G02F1/13, G02F1/29, H04B10/116, H04B10/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLSTRAHLSTEUERUNG | [2019/42] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL BEAM CONTROL | [2019/42] | French: | COMMANDE DE FAISCEAU À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 05.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014161466 (RIZA NABEEL AGHA [IE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0060] , [ 104] * * figures 9(a)-9(b) *; | [XYI]US2015252984 (VAN BOMMEL TIES [NL], et al) [X] 1,6,8,10,11,15,17 * figure 1a * * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] * [Y] 9,18 [I] 2-5,7,12-14,16; | [Y]WO2016082031 (LENSVECTOR INC [US], et al) [Y] 9,18* TECHNICAL FIELD *; | [A]US2016302275 (NEWTON PHILIP STEVEN [NL], et al) [A] 1-18 * figures 2A,2B,2C,3 * * paragraphs [0055] - [0057] * | International search | [XY]US2008284924 (HOFMANN BERND [DE], et al) [X] 9-11, 14-20, 23-26 * ? abstract; paras. [0002], [0023]-[0026], [0031], [0032], [0035], [0039], [0042]-[0044], [0047], [0048], [0055], [0060] and [0062]; Figure 1 ? * [Y] 3-6, 8, 29, 30; | [XP]WO2017041167 (LENSVECTOR INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-26* ? entire document ? *; | [XY] - GOMEZ, A. et al., "Beyond 100-Gb/s Indoor Wide Field-of-View Optical Wireless Communications", IEEE Photonics Technology Letters, (20150215), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 367 - 370, XP011570918 [X] 1, 2, 7, 27, 28, 31, 32 * . ? section II; Figures 1-3 ? * [Y] 3-6, 8, 29, 30 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2014.2374995 | by applicant | US2015252984 | US2016302275 |