EP3422248 - FINGERPRINT MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Goodix Technology Co., Ltd. Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Weitian c/o Floor 13 Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Yiping c/o Floor 13 Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17892750.5 | 22.01.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017CN72042 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018133059 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422248 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G06V40/1329 (EP,US);
G06V40/13 (CN);
G06V40/1306 (EP,US);
H01L23/04 (US);
H01L23/10 (US);
H01L24/16 (US);
H01L2224/16225 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Title | German: | FINGERABDRUCKMODUL | [2019/01] | English: | FINGERPRINT MODULE | [2019/01] | French: | MODULE D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2018 | Translation filed | 25.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2020 | 18.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/07] | 28.09.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 03.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015071509 (MYERS SCOTT A [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0058] , [0059] , [0061] , [0069] , [0083] , [0084] , [0110] , [0113] , [0122]; figures 2,3,8,9 *; | [A]EP3101588 (SHENZHEN HUIDING TECHNOLOGY CO [CN]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0018] , [0019] , [0020] , [0023] , [0027]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2016239699 (CHANG SHU-MING [TW], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0043] - [0045]; figures 16,17 * | International search | [X]CN105117715 (NANCHANG OUFEI BIOLOGY IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0029]-[0050], and figure 2 *; | [X]CN105260707 (NANCHANG OUFEI BIOLOGY IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0034]-[0055], and figure 2 *; | [A]CN105117714 (NANCHANG OUFEI BIOLOGY IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN104615981 (NAT CT FOR ADVANCED PACKAGING) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN105046244 (NANCHANG OUFEI BIOLOGY IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10 * , entire document * |