02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
07.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
17.11.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
25.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
30.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
09.12.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
02.12.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.12.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.12.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.07.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
29.07.2022 |
Change - inventor |
|
09.12.2021 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
26.11.2021 |
Change - first examination report |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
15.10.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.06.2021 |
First examination report |
|
25.02.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.12.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
04.12.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
14.08.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
14.08.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
01.05.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
01.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.05.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
05.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
10.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|