Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019061517 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN105071 | 30.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11119874 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2021 | B2 | US2020159635 | 21.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN105071 | 30.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109328340B | Global Dossier | 08.06.2021 | B | CN109328340 | 12.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN105071 | 30.09.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3660681 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2023 | B1 | EP3660681 | 16.09.2020 | A4 | EP3660681 | 03.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN105071 | 30.09.2017 |