Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.07.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
24.03.2023 | First examination report | |
23.03.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.12.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.12.2020 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] |
18.12.2020 | Change - extension states | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] |
14.10.2020 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
09.10.2020 | Change - classification | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
29.05.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
29.05.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
15.04.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.03.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.03.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.03.2020 | Change - representative | |
27.03.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.05.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.04.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication |