Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020262743 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710950164 | 13.10.2017 | WO2017CN117801 | 21.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102426299B | Global Dossier | 27.07.2022 | B1 | KR20200054287 | 19.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710950164 | 13.10.2017 | WO2017CN117801 | 21.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7026785B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2022 | B2 | JP2020536838 | 17.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710950164 | 13.10.2017 | WO2017CN117801 | 21.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110226364B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2021 | B | CN110226364 | 10.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710950164 | 13.10.2017 | WO2017CN117801 | 21.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3675610 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2020 | A4 | EP3675610 | 01.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710950164 | 13.10.2017 | WO2017CN117801 | 21.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2747875 | 17.05.2021 | C1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710950164 | 13.10.2017 | WO2017CN117801 | 21.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019071835 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710950164 | 13.10.2017 |