30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
31.05.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
23.06.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.06.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.06.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.02.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.02.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.02.2022 |
First examination report |
|
28.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.06.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
26.02.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
26.02.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
30.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
25.09.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
31.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
17.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|