EP3730462 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING GLASS ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitro, S.A.B. de C.V. Keramos 225 Poniente Col. Del Prado Monterrey, Nuevo Léon 64410 / MX | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIJERINA RAMOS, Victor Aldama Sur No. 415, Departamento 7 Col. Centro C.P. 64000 Monterrey, Nuevo León / MX | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 17935730.6 | 20.12.2017 | [2020/44] | WO2017MX00173 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019125116 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | ES | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730462 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3730462 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03B9/453 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C03B9/4535 (EP);
C03B35/10 (US);
C03B35/125 (US);
C03B9/3841 (US);
C03B9/453 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERFÜHREN VON GLASGEGENSTÄNDEN | [2020/44] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING GLASS ITEMS | [2020/44] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRANSFERT D'ARTICLES EN VERRE | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2020 | Translation filed | 16.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | DK | 26.07.2023 | |
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | DK | 26.07.2023 | |
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | DK | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3449104 (HAMILTON JOSEPH R) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [AD]US3650725 (OKUMURA AKIHIRO, et al) [AD] 1-15 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0037799 (PETER FRITZ [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [AD]US5429651 (BOLIN JAMES A [US]) [AD] 1-15* figure 11 * | International search | [A]US3449104 (HAMILTON JOSEPH R) [A] 1-15 * , Columna 2, Ifnea 70 - columna 5, línea 30; figuras 1-8 *; | [A]US3650725 (OKUMURA AKIHIRO, et al) [A] 1-15 * , Resumen; figuras (citado en la solicitud) *; | [A]US6173661 (VAJDA VLADIMIR [CH]) [A] 1-15* , Resumen; figuras *; | [A]US2004050661 (LEIDY D WAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , Resumen; figuras *; | [A]EP2269958 (BOTTERO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * , Resumen; figuras 1,2 *; | [A]US2013153367 (FELGENHAUER BENEDIKT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * , Resumen; figuras * | by applicant | US4162911 | US5429651 | JP3650725B |