Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018238339 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815899037 | 19.02.2018 | US201762462070 | 22.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180097164 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201815899037 | 19.02.2018 | US201762462070 | 22.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018135885 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201815899037 | 19.02.2018 | US201762462070 | 22.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108457896 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201815899037 | 19.02.2018 | US201762462070 | 22.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3366926 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2020 | B1 | EP3366926 | 29.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762462070 | 22.02.2017 |