EP3343999 - NODES AND METHODS FOR RANDOM ACCESS IN DUAL CONNECTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/27] | A NODE AND METHOD FOR RANDOM ACCESS IN DUAL CONNECTIVITY | ||
[2020/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/23] |
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMAN, Imadur Rådjursstigen 20 191 46 SOLLENTUNA / SE | 02 /
YANG, Yu Meanderslingan 8 170 62 SOLNA / SE | 03 /
GUO, Zhiheng No.5, Lize East Street, Chaoyang District BEIJING, 100102 / CN | 04 /
LI, Shaohua No.5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District BEIJING, 100102 / CN | 05 /
LARSSON, Daniel Parternas Gränd 65 226 47 LUND / SE | 06 /
SONG, Xinghua No.5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District BEIJING, 100102 / CN | [2021/23] |
Former [2018/27] | 01 /
RAHMAN, Imadur Rådjursstigen 20 SE-191 46 SOLLENTUNA / SE | ||
02 /
YANG, Yu Meanderslingan 8 SE-170 62 SOLNA / SE | |||
03 /
GUO, Zhiheng No.5, Lize East Street, Chaoyang District BEIJING, 100102 / CN | |||
04 /
LI, Shaohua No.5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District BEIJING, 100102 / CN | |||
05 /
LARSSON, Daniel Parternas Gränd 65 SE-226 47 LUND / SE | |||
06 /
SONG, Xinghua No.5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District BEIJING, 100102 / CN | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 18158186.9 | 07.11.2013 | [2018/27] | Priority number, date | US201361863578P | 08.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361863578 P | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343999 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3343999 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W76/15, // H04W74/00, H04W84/04 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W74/006 (US);
H04W74/002 (EP,US);
H04W74/0838 (EP);
H04W84/047 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | H04W74/08, H04W84/04, H04W72/04, H04W74/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KNOTEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIREKTZUGRIFF IN EINER DUALKONNEKTIVITÄT | [2018/27] | English: | NODES AND METHODS FOR RANDOM ACCESS IN DUAL CONNECTIVITY | [2020/19] | French: | NOEUDS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE DANS UNE CONNECTIVITÉ DOUBLE | [2020/19] |
Former [2018/27] | A NODE AND METHOD FOR RANDOM ACCESS IN DUAL CONNECTIVITY | ||
Former [2018/27] | N UD ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE DANS UNE CONNECTIVITÉ DOUBLE | Examination procedure | 28.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 28.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13795885.6 / EP3031278 | Divisional application(s) | EP21176762.9 / EP3893590 | EP23189431.2 / EP4280794 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2013 | AL | 09.06.2021 | AT | 09.06.2021 | CY | 09.06.2021 | CZ | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | MK | 09.06.2021 | MT | 09.06.2021 | RS | 09.06.2021 | SE | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | SM | 09.06.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | GR | 10.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | PT | 11.10.2021 | LU | 07.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 07.11.2013 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
MK | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 07.11.2013 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 07.11.2013 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
LU | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 09.06.2021 | |
BG | 09.09.2021 |