EP3366360 - SPINNING TOP TOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tomy Company, Ltd. 7-9-10, Tateishi Katsushika-ku Tokyo 124-8511 / JP | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKI, Makoto 7-9-10 Tateishi, Katsushika-ku Tokyo, 124-8511 / JP | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18158877.3 | 27.02.2018 | [2018/35] | Priority number, date | JP20170035083 | 27.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017035083 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366360 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A63H1/00, A63H1/02 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
A63H1/00 (EP,US);
A63F9/16 (US);
A63H1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREISELSPIELZEUG | [2018/35] | English: | SPINNING TOP TOY | [2018/35] | French: | JOUET TOUPIE | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 26.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3071767U (*) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]US6364734 (NG RICKY [HK]) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]JP3088350U (*) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]JP5959773B (TOMY CO LTD; TOKYO UNIQUE:KK) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | by applicant | JP5959773B |