Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
17.06.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.04.2019 | Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
03.01.2019 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
02.11.2018 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
02.11.2018 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
02.11.2018 | Change - designated states | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
27.07.2018 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
28.02.2018 | Change - representative |