Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018243661 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017035083 | 27.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018139744 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2018 | A | JP6232153B | 15.11.2017 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017035083 | 27.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3366360 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017035083 | 27.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN207384826U | 22.05.2018 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2017035083 | 27.02.2017 |