13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
12.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
05.11.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
17.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
27.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
11.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
27.11.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
20.11.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.11.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.11.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.11.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
06.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.07.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.05.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.05.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
04.05.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.09.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
28.08.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
27.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|