EP3418404 - METHOD FOR INCREASING RECYCLED MANGANESE CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energizer Brands, LLC 533 Maryville University Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slezak, Philip J. 36139 Maple Drive North Ridgeville, 44039 / US | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18175968.9 | 05.06.2018 | [2018/52] | Priority number, date | US201715629177 | 21.06.2017 Original published format: US201715629177 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3418404 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3418404 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/44, C22B7/00, C22B47/00, H01M6/52 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
H01M6/52 (EP,US);
C01G45/02 (US);
C22B3/44 (EP,US);
C22B47/00 (EP,US);
C22B7/006 (EP,US);
H01M4/38 (EP,US);
H01M4/42 (US);
H01M4/50 (EP,US);
H01M6/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2018/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES RECYCELTEN MANGANGEHALTS | [2018/52] | English: | METHOD FOR INCREASING RECYCLED MANGANESE CONTENT | [2018/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR AUGMENTER LA TENEUR EN MANGANÈSE RECYCLÉ | [2018/52] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 15.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US8728419 (SMITH W NOVIS [US], et al) [XD] 3* the whole document *; | [X] - SANCHEZ L ET AL, "Sulphidization-cyanidation of jarosite species: Applicability to the gossan ores of Rio Tinto", HYDROMETALLURGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING CY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960801), vol. 42, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0304-386X(95)00076-S, ISSN 0304-386X, pages 35 - 49, XP004040678 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-386X(95)00076-S | [X] - DUTRIZAC J E, "Factors Affecting the Precipitation of Potassium Jarosite in Sulfate and Chloride Media", METALLURGICAL AND MATERIALS TRANSACTIONS B, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NEW YORK, (20081115), vol. 39, no. 6, ISSN 1543-1916, pages 771 - 783, XP019698064 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | US8728419 | US8911696 | US9620790 | - SAYILGAN E. et al., "A review of technologies for the recovery of metals from spent alkaline and zinc-carbon batteries", Hydrometallurgy, (20090000), vol. 97, pages 158 - 166 |