Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014118349 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313756823 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9141325 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2015 | B2 | US2014223043 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313756823 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3809265 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2022 | B1 | EP3809265 | 21.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18179638 | 01.02.2013 | EP20206015 | 01.02.2013 | EP19203212 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3629169 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2020 | B1 | EP3629169 | 01.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18179638 | 01.02.2013 | EP19203212 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2763037 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2018 | B1 | EP2763037 | 06.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2996140 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2022 | C | CA2996140 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313756823 | 01.02.2013 | CA2899404 | 31.01.2014 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2899404 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2018 | C | CA2899404 | 07.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313756823 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | WO2014EP51969 | 31.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014211318B | Global Dossier | 04.08.2016 | B2 | AU2014211318 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313756823 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | WO2014EP51969 | 31.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3413199 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2019 | B1 | EP3413199 | 12.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18179638 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3629169T | 22.03.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP18179638 | 01.02.2013 | EP19203212 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3809265T | 04.07.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20206015 | 01.02.2013 | EP19203212 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2693111T | 07.12.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2774207T | 17.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP18179638 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2863414T | 11.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP19203212 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2924805T | 11.10.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20206015 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS61578 | 29.04.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP19203212 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS63386 | 31.08.2022 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP20206015 | 01.02.2013 | EP13305125 | 01.02.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3629169 | EP3809265 | Type | Earlier application | EP2763037 |