Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
16.02.2021 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.01.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.05.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
14.12.2018 | Change - representative |