Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11454213 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2022 | B2 | US2022025861 | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18212370 | 13.12.2018 | WO2019EP79839 | 31.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3870845 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | B1 | EP3870845 | 01.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18212370 | 13.12.2018 | WO2019EP79839 | 31.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113167232B | Global Dossier | 30.07.2024 | B | CN113167232 | 23.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18212370 | 13.12.2018 | WO2019EP79839 | 31.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3870845T | 07.08.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP18212370 | 13.12.2018 | WO2019EP79839 | 31.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2953043T | 07.11.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP18212370 | 13.12.2018 | WO2019EP79839 | 31.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020120017 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18212370 | 13.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3667064 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18212370 | 13.12.2018 |