EP3667064 - DAMPING VIBRATIONS IN A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egedal, Per St. Lundgard vej 65 7400 Herning / DK | 02 /
Hoegh, Gustav Nyboesgade, 21, ST, TV 7100 Vejle / DK | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18212370.3 | 13.12.2018 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667064 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
F03D7/0296 (EP,US);
F03D7/0224 (EP,US);
F03D7/0232 (EP,US);
F05B2240/3052 (EP,US);
F05B2240/3062 (US);
F05B2260/96 (US);
F05B2260/964 (EP);
F05B2270/334 (EP,US);
F05B2270/807 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFUNG VON SCHWINGUNGEN IN EINER WINDTURBINE | [2020/25] | English: | DAMPING VIBRATIONS IN A WIND TURBINE | [2020/25] | French: | AMORTISSEMENT DE VIBRATIONS DANS UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 26.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2128385 (FRONTIER WIND LLC [US]); | [A]WO2010084131 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al); | [A]WO2013087468 (LM WIND POWER AS [DK]); | by applicant | US5106265 | EP1623111 | US8851840 | WO2018041420 |