Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9850480 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2017198278 | 13.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414296732 | 05.06.2014 | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | US201715409189 | 18.01.2017 | US201213262624 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9580741 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2017 | B2 | US2014349291 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414296732 | 05.06.2014 | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | US201213262624 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8771948 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2014 | B2 | US2012178918 | 12.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | US201013262624 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12077752 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2024 | B2 | US2021163920 | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414296732 | 05.06.2014 | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | US201715813979 | 15.11.2017 | US202017088000 | 03.11.2020 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | US201715409189 | 18.01.2017 | US201816038071 | 17.07.2018 | US201213262624 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10858645 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2020 | B2 | US2019010486 | 10.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414296732 | 05.06.2014 | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | US201715813979 | 15.11.2017 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | US201715409189 | 18.01.2017 | US201816038071 | 17.07.2018 | US201213262624 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10053685 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2018 | B2 | US2018073010 | 15.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414296732 | 05.06.2014 | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | US201715813979 | 15.11.2017 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | US201715409189 | 18.01.2017 | US201213262624 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3964586 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | EP10759416 | 01.04.2010 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | EP18214114 | 01.04.2010 | EP16203716 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3211095 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2019 | B1 | EP3211095 | 30.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | EP10759416 | 01.04.2010 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2414545 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2017 | B1 | EP2414545 | 15.01.2014 | A4 | EP2414545 | 08.02.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2757493 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2018 | C | CA2757493 | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3514244 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2021 | B1 | EP3514244 | 24.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US29653 | 01.04.2010 | EP10759416 | 01.04.2010 | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | EP16203716 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010115016 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2011 | A3 | WO2010115016 | 07.10.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US16667109 | 03.04.2009 | Type | Divisional application | EP3964586 | Type | Earlier application | EP2414545 | EP3211095 |