EP3514244 - NUCLEIC ACID PREPARATION METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/30] | NUCLEIC ACID PREPARATION COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | ||
[2021/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sequenom, Inc. 3595 John Hopkins Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISNIEWSKI, Michele 3574 Trenton Avenue San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 02 /
KWONG, William 4064 Huerfano Ave., 156 San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 03 /
MOHSENIAN, Firouz 3574 Trenton Avenue San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 04 /
DING, Jian-Hua 7984 Camino Jonata San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/30] | Application number, filing date | 18214114.3 | 01.04.2010 | [2019/30] | Priority number, date | US200916667109P | 03.04.2009 Original published format: US 16667109 P | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3514244 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3514244 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6806, C12N15/10, C12N15/11 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C12N15/1006 (EP,US);
C12N15/1003 (US);
C12Q1/68 (US);
C12Q1/6834 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2565/137, C12Q2527/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/30] | C12Q1/68, C12N15/10, C12N15/11 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] |
Former [2019/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN | [2021/01] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID PREPARATION METHODS | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES | [2021/01] |
Former [2019/30] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN | ||
Former [2019/30] | NUCLEIC ACID PREPARATION COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | ||
Former [2019/30] | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES | Examination procedure | 23.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 23.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10759416.0 / EP2414545 | EP16203716.2 / EP3211095 | Divisional application(s) | EP21182343.0 / EP3964586 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2010 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | DK | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | IT | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | NL | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | SE | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | TR | 07.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | IE | 01.04.2022 | LU | 01.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2022 | ||
LU | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2022 | ||
LU | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.04.2010 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2022 | ||
LU | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2022 | ||
LU | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5705628 (HAWKINS TREVOR [US]); | [I]WO9958664 (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US]); | [I]WO03040687 (CORTEX BIOCHEM INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US4656127 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4851331 | US4965188 | US5075212 | US5492806 | US5525464 | US5547835 | US5589330 | US5605798 | US5656493 | WO9737041 | US5679524 | US5691141 | US5695940 | US5786146 | US5834189 | US5849483 | US5849542 | US5851770 | US5869242 | US5876934 | US5891625 | US5908755 | US5912118 | US5928906 | US5952174 | US5958692 | US5976802 | US5981186 | US5998143 | US6004744 | US6013431 | US6013499 | US6017702 | US6018041 | US6043031 | US6046005 | US6045996 | US6087095 | US6110684 | WO0052625 | US6136541 | US6140054 | US6142681 | US6156501 | US6183958 | US6194144 | US6197506 | WO0120039 | US6210891 | US6214560 | WO0125485 | WO0127326 | WO0127327 | WO0127329 | US6223127 | WO0129259 | US6225625 | US6229911 | US6239273 | US6258538 | US2003082600 | US2003180779 | US6723513 | WO2005023091 | US2005112590 | US2005287592 | US7169314 | US2007202525 | WO2005EP12707 | WO2007US69991 | WO2007US71232 | US20070968876 | US20070968878 | US20070950395 | US20080021871 |