EP3571192 - JAK1 SELECTIVE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrazeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSSON, Karl, Magnus AstraZeneca 431 83 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
ÅSTRAND, Annika, Birgitta, Margareta AstraZeneca 431 83 Mölndal / SE | 03 /
BERGGREN, Anna, Ingrid, Kristina AstraZeneca 431 83 Mölndal / SE | 04 /
JOHANSSON, Johan, R. AstraZeneca 431 83 Mölndal / SE | 05 /
LEPISTÖ, Matti, Juhani AstraZeneca 431 83 Mölndal / SE | 06 /
KAWATKAR, Sameer, Pralhad Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | 07 /
SU, Qibin Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP 1800 Concord Pike Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | 08 /
KETTLE, Jason, Grant 1 Francis Crick Avenue Cambridge Biomedical Campus Cambridge CB2 0AA / GB | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Eastbrook House Shaftesbury Road Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | ||
Former [2019/48] | AstraZeneca Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | Application number, filing date | 18701296.8 | 16.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018EP51038 | Priority number, date | US201762447057P | 17.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762447057 P | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018134213 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571192 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3571192 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/04, C07D403/14, A61K31/506, A61P17/14, A61P37/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
A61P37/00 (EP,EA,IL,KR);
C07D403/04 (EP,EA,IL,KR);
A61K9/0075 (EA,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P17/14 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61P3/10 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | 19.08.2019 | ME | 19.08.2019 | Validation states | MA | 19.08.2019 | TN | 19.08.2019 | Title | German: | JAK1-SELEKTIVE INHIBITOREN | [2019/48] | English: | JAK1 SELECTIVE INHIBITORS | [2019/48] | French: | INHIBITEURS SÉLECTIFS DE JAK1 | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 19.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22209765.1 / EP4219470 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009046416 (TARGEGEN INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2009118567 (UNIV NOTTINGHAM [GB], et al); | [AP]WO2017050938 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE]) | by applicant | WO2015061665 |