|
07.05.2024 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2024 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2024 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2020 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2019 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.08.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
89 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
06.07.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.06.2018 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.06.2018 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Reply to invitation to furnish sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Invitation to furnish nucleotide and/or Amino Acid Sequence Listing |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Invitation to furnish nucleotide and/or amino acid sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
65 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
7 |