Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3601351
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.05.2024 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.03.2024 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
14.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.11.2021 |
First examination report |
|
15.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2020 |
Change - inventor |
|
29.05.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
29.05.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
24.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2020 |
Change - inventor |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
03.01.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] |
03.01.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.01.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] |
09.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
21.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|