EP3601351 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCTION OF IMMUNOGENICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene Corporation Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Celgene Corporation 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Jeffrey, C. 5402 Foxtail Loop Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 02 /
DEARTH, Lawrence 602 Shanas Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 03 /
HADJIVASSILIOU, Haralambos 12791 Calle De La Siena San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
SUN, Jeonghoon 118 Dellbrook Ave San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 05 /
HARIHARAN, Kandasamy 6699 Granite Crest Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | 01 /
JOHNSON, Jeffrey, C. 5402 Foxtail Loop Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | ||
02 /
DEARTH, Lawrence 602 Shanas Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | |||
03 /
HADJIVASSILIOU, Haralambos 12791 Calle De La Siena San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
04 /
SUN, Jeonghoon 118 Dellbrook Ave San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | |||
05 /
HARIHARAN, Kandasamy 6575 Little Mcgonigle Ranch Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
Former [2020/06] | 01 /
JOHNSON, Jeffrey, C. 5402 Foxtail Loop Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | ||
02 /
DEARTH, Lawrence 602 Shanas Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | |||
03 /
HADJIVASSILIOU, Haralambos 12791 Calle De La Siena San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
04 /
SUN, Jeonghoon 4992 35th Street San Diego, CA 92116 / US | |||
05 /
HARIHARAN, Kandasamy 6575 Little Mcgonigle Ranch Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18718270.4 | 26.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US24316 | Priority number, date | US201762477257P | 27.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762477257 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018183182 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3601351 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/00 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,EA,KR);
A61K39/0011 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K38/19 (KR);
A61K38/20 (KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P35/00 (KR);
C07K16/2887 (EP,EA,KR);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
A61K2039/507 (EP,EA,KR);
A61K2039/577 (EP,EA);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER IMMUNOGENITÄT | [2020/06] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCTION OF IMMUNOGENICITY | [2020/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LA RÉDUCTION D'IMMUNOGÉNICITÉ | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 21.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2017081407 (GROSVELD FRANK [NL], et al); | by applicant | EP0239400 | US4816567 | US4816397 | WO9109967 | WO9222324 | EP0519596 | US5225539 | WO9317105 | WO9404678 | EP0592106 | WO9425591 | US5530101 | WO9627011 | US5565332 | US5585089 | US5693780 | US5709874 | US5759542 | US5766886 | US5807715 | US5837242 | US5840674 | US5869620 | US5900252 | US5972366 | US5985307 | US5989830 | US6005079 | US6004534 | US6039975 | US6048736 | US6060082 | US6071495 | US6120751 | US6132992 | US6131570 | US6139865 | WO0144301 | US6253872 | US6271359 | US6274552 | US6316652 | US6331415 | US6407213 | US2005042664 | US7183076 | US7709226 | US7951917 | US8227577 | US8586713 | US2014046030 | US2014066598 | US2014140989 | WO2016109415 |