EP3652242 - FLAME-RETARDANT POLYAMIDE COMPOSITIONS WITH A HIGH HEAT DEFLECTION TEMPERATURE, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2020/37] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Clariant Plastics & Coatings Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Harald Rauschgraben 36 50170 Kerpen / DE | 02 /
HÖROLD, Sebastian Latzfonderstrasse 30 86420 Diedorf / DE | 03 /
SICKEN, Martin Mainstrasse 40A 51149 Köln / DE | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Carola Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18740538.6 | 06.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018EP68321 | Priority number, date | DE201710212098 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: DE102017212098 | [2020/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019011790 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652242 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3652242 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/49, C08K5/5313, C08K7/14, C08L77/00 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
C08K5/49 (EP);
C08K5/0066 (EP,KR,US);
C08K7/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08K5/5313 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08J5/043 (KR);
C08K3/32 (KR);
C08K5/5317 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08L77/00 (KR);
C08L77/06 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0066, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08K5/49, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08K5/5313, C08L77/06 (CN);
C08K5/5317, C08L77/06 (CN); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAMMHEMMENDE POLYAMIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT HOHER WÄRMEFORMBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2020/21] | English: | FLAME-RETARDANT POLYAMIDE COMPOSITIONS WITH A HIGH HEAT DEFLECTION TEMPERATURE, AND USE THEREOF | [2020/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYAMIDE IGNIFUGES AYANT UNE RÉSISTANCE À LA DÉFORMATION À CHAUD ÉLEVÉE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 14.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2018 | AL | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | ES | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | MT | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 06.07.2018 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2025710 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [A] 1-16 * examples 3-5,8,9,12-14; tables 1-3 *; | [A]WO2009109318 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 12, line 10 - line 15 ** examples 3-10,13-15,25-28; tables 1,2,5 * | by applicant | DE2252258 | DE2447727 | DE19607635 | DE19734437 | DE19737727 | WO0228953 | US7420007 | DE102010018682 | WO2012045414 | DE102011120218 | WO2014135256 | DE102014001222 | WO2016065971 |