EP3573015 - ASSISTANCE METHOD AND ASSISTANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKADO, Masashi c/o Konica Minolta Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | 02 /
MIURA, Masanori c/o Konica Minolta Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Alton, Andrew Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Alton, Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18742132.6 | 05.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018JP00087 | Priority number, date | JP20170007895 | 19.01.2017 Original published format: JP 2017007895 | [2019/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018135317 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573015 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/22, A61G12/00, G08B25/04 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G16H40/20 (EP);
G16H30/20 (US);
A61G12/00 (EP,US);
G06Q50/22 (EP);
G08B25/04 (EP);
H04N23/61 (US);
A61B5/0077 (US);
A61B5/1115 (US);
A61B5/1117 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | UNTERSTÜTZUNGSVERFAHREN UND UNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/48] | English: | ASSISTANCE METHOD AND ASSISTANCE SYSTEM | [2019/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2019 | Translation filed | 16.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 01.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/01] | 03.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2004259162 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [I] 1-9* paragraphs [0006] - [0054] *; | [I]JP2016085673 (FUJI INSATSU KK) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0007] - [0043] * | International search | [YA]JP2000132561 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-6, 8, 9 * , paragraphs [0032]-[0040], fig. 1, 2, 7 (Family: none) * [A] 7; | [Y]JP2004259162 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 8 * , paragraph [0028] (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2013140532 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [Y] 1-6, 8, 9 * , paragraphs [0036]-[0078], fig. 1, 11-21 (Family: none) * [A] 7; | [A]WO2016199502 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) [A] 1-9* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2014215687 | JP2017007895 |