Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018089739 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662420586 | 11.11.2016 | US201762450191 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11296534 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2019393713 | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762450586 | 26.01.2017 | US201816480929 | 24.01.2018 | WO2018IL50092 | 24.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10961663 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2021 | B2 | US2018209098 | 26.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762450586 | 26.01.2017 | US201715809008 | 10.11.2017 | US201762450191 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3538709 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662420586 | 11.11.2016 | WO2017US61008 | 10.11.2017 | US201762450191 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109937278 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662420586 | 11.11.2016 | WO2017US61008 | 10.11.2017 | US201762450191 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3574565 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2021 | B1 | EP3574565 | 26.08.2020 | A4 | EP3574565 | 04.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762450586 | 26.01.2017 | WO2018IL50092 | 24.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019007285 | 09.07.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662420586 | 11.11.2016 | WO2017US61008 | 10.11.2017 | US201762450191 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2019005114 | 05.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662420586 | 11.11.2016 | WO2017US61008 | 10.11.2017 | US201762450191 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018138726 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762450586 | 26.01.2017 |