02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
01.12.2023 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
27.10.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
25.10.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.05.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
19.05.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
19.05.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
19.05.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
21.03.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
29.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.02.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.02.2021 |
First examination report |
|
18.09.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
18.09.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
20.08.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
17.04.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.04.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
24.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
05.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|