EP3652793 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING BATTERY PACK TEMPERATURE AND STATE OF CHARGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPS Technology Holdings LLC 250 Vesey Street 15th Floor New York, New York 10281 / US | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Zhihong, H. W270N2588 Orchard Lane Pewaukee, WI 53072 / US | 02 /
WITT, Renate 7556 N. 53rd Street Milwaukee, WI 53223 / US | 03 /
WOOD, Steven, J. 4490 North Woodburn Street Shorewood, WI 53211 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Mark, R. 2618 North Oakland Avenue 22 Milwaukee, WI 53211 / US | 05 /
IVERSON, Michael, E. W183N6041 Lost Pond Ct. Menomonee Falls, WI 53051 / US | 06 /
ELBERSON, Matthew N51W16987 Old Hickory Road Menomonee Falls, WI 53051 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/21] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18749226.9 | 12.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018US41882 | Priority number, date | US201762531769P | 12.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762531769 P | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019014484 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652793 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3652793 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/48, H01M10/42, B60L50/64, H01M50/204, H01M50/249 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
H01M10/482 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/204 (EP,CN,US);
B60L58/12 (US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (US);
H01M10/425 (CN,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | H01M2/10, H01M10/48, H01M10/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER AKKUTEMPERATUR UND LADEZUSTAND | [2023/25] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING BATTERY PACK TEMPERATURE AND STATE OF CHARGE | [2020/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DETERMINATION DE LA TEMPERATURE ET DE L'ETAT DE CHARGE D'UN BLOC DE BATTERIES | [2023/25] |
Former [2020/21] | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER TEMPERATUR UND DES LADEZUSTANDES EINES BATTERIEPACKS | ||
Former [2020/21] | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE ET DE L'ÉTAT DE CHARGE D'UN BLOC-BATTERIE | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 05.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23212600.3 / EP4340111 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2015318724 (BROCKMAN DARYL C [US], et al) [X] 1-16* paragraphs [0045] - [0046]; figure 7 * |