EP3645481 - CERAMIC COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oulun yliopisto Pentti Kaiteran katu 1 90570 Oulu / FI | [2024/22] |
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Oulun yliopisto Pentti Kaiteran katu 1 90570 Oulu / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNU, Jari c/o Oulun yliopisto Pentti Kaiteran katu 1 90570 Oulu / FI | 02 /
JUUTI, Jari c/o Oulun yliopisto Pentti Kaiteran katu 1 90570 Oulu / FI | 03 /
JANTUNEN, Heli c/o Oulun yliopisto Pentti Kaiteran katu 1 90570 Oulu / FI | 04 /
NELO, Mikko c/o Oulun yliopisto Pentti Kaiteran katu 1 90570 Oulu / FI | 05 /
SIPONKOSKI, Tuomo c/o Oulun yliopisto Pentti Kaiteran katu 1 90570 Oulu / FI | 06 /
KÄHÄRI, Hanna c/o Oulun yliopisto Pentti Kaiteran katu 1 90570 Oulu / FI | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2024/22] |
Former [2020/19] | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 18752176.0 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018FI50518 | Priority number, date | FI20170005635 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: FI 20175635 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002695 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645481 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3645481 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/00, C04B35/01, C04B35/117, C04B35/26, C04B35/46, C04B35/468, C04B35/491, C04B35/628, C04B35/645, C04B35/495, B22F3/00, C22C1/00 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
C04B35/00 (EP,US);
B22F1/052 (EP,US);
B22F3/02 (EP,US);
C04B35/01 (EP);
C04B35/117 (EP);
C04B35/26 (EP);
C04B35/46 (EP);
C04B35/4682 (EP);
C04B35/491 (EP);
C04B35/495 (EP);
C04B35/624 (EP);
C04B35/62805 (EP);
C04B35/62886 (EP);
C04B35/645 (EP);
C22C1/00 (EP);
C22C1/051 (US);
C22C32/0015 (EP,US);
C22C32/0021 (EP);
C22C32/0026 (EP);
C22C32/0036 (EP);
C22C33/0292 (EP);
B22F2302/25 (US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP);
C04B2235/3203 (EP);
C04B2235/3213 (EP);
C04B2235/3215 (EP);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3239 (EP);
C04B2235/3256 (EP);
C04B2235/3258 (EP);
C04B2235/3279 (EP);
C04B2235/444 (EP);
C04B2235/447 (EP);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/5472 (EP);
C04B2235/604 (EP);
C04B2235/768 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KERAMISCHER VERBUNDSTOFF | [2020/19] | English: | CERAMIC COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2020/19] | French: | MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE DE CÉRAMIQUE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 15.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009188789 (HONECKER DAVE [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * whole document, see figures 1 & 2; para. [0056]-[0095] *; | [XAI]US2017088471 (RANDALL CLIVE A [US], et al) [X] 12 * whole document, but in particular - para. [0009], [0084]-[0086] & [0050] * [A] 1-9 [I] 10,11,13-17; | [XAI] - HANNA KÄHÄRI ET AL, "Improvements and Modifications to Room-Temperature Fabrication Method for Dielectric Li 2 MoO 4 Ceramics", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY., US, (20150122), vol. 98, no. 3, doi:10.1111/jace.13471, ISSN 0002-7820, pages 687 - 689, XP055385073 [X] 12 * whole document, but see in particular II- Experimental Procedure, figure 1 & Table I. * [A] 1-9 [I] 13-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jace.13471 | [XAI] - MARIA VÄÄTÄJÄ ET AL, "Li 2 MoO 4 -based composite ceramics fabricated from temperature- and atmosphere-sensitive MnZn ferrite at room temperature", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY., US, (20170427), vol. 100, no. 8, doi:10.1111/jace.14914, ISSN 0002-7820, pages 3626 - 3635, XP055505019 [X] 12 * whole document, but see in particular the abstract, 2 Experimental Procedure * [A] 1-9 [I] 13-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jace.14914 | [XAI] - Hanna Kähäri ET AL, "Room-temperature fabrication of microwave dielectric Li2MoO4-TiO2 composite ceramics", (20160415), URL: https://ac.els-cdn.com/S0272884216304758/1-s2.0-S0272884216304758-main.pdf?_tid=2bb771e9-1de2-44f5-876b-9a8973ca306e&acdnat=1536226830_e2a3998b4383d187c14dbde9ec0a3d43, (20180906), XP055505015 [X] 12 * whole document, but see in particular 2. Materials and methods, table 1 & figures 1 a) & b) * [A] 1-9 [I] 13-17 | [XAI] - Jing Guo ET AL, "Cold Sintering: A Paradigm Shift for Processing and Integration of Ceramics", (20160811), URL: file:///C:/Users/NB52505/Downloads/Guo_et_al-2016-Angewandte_Chemie_International_Edition.pdf, (20171024), XP055418463 [X] 12 * whole document - see in particular the Experimental Section on page 11460 * [A] 1-9 [I] 13-17 | [IA] - INDUJA I J ET AL, "Microwave dielectric properties of mineral sillimanite obtained by conventional and cold sintering process", JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, ESSEX, GB, (20170116), vol. 37, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.JEURCERAMSOC.2017.01.007, ISSN 0955-2219, pages 2143 - 2147, XP029907905 [I] 12,13 * whole document, 2. Experimenta, figures 4 (a) & (b) * [A] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jeurceramsoc.2017.01.007 | [XAI] - LI HE ET AL, "Low-Temperature Sintering Li 2 MoO 4 /Ni 0.5 Zn 0.5 Fe 2 O 4 Magneto-Dielectric Composites for High-Frequency Application", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY., US, (20140618), vol. 97, no. 8, doi:10.1111/jace.12981, ISSN 0002-7820, pages 2552 - 2556, XP055505144 [X] 12 * II. Experimental Procedure, figure 1 * [A] 13 [I] 14-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jace.12981 | [XPAI] - DAWEI WANG ET AL, "Cold-Sintered Temperature Stable Na 0.5 Bi 0.5 MoO 4 -Li 2 MoO 4 Microwave Composite Ceramics", ACS SUSTAINABLE CHEMISTRY & ENGINEERING, US, (20180105), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1021/acssuschemeng.7b03889, ISSN 2168-0485, pages 2438 - 2444, XP055505083 [XP] 12,13 * whole document - see in particular the abstract, the Experimental Section & figure 5 * [A] 1-9 [I] 14-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acssuschemeng.7b03889 | [IP] - JON-PAUL MARIA ET AL, "Cold Sintering: Current Status and Prospects", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, US, (20170718), vol. 32, no. 17, doi:10.1557/jmr.2017.262, ISSN 0884-2914, pages 3205 - 3218, XP055420039 [IP] 12,13 * whole document, see in particular figures 1(k) & figures 10(a) & (b) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/jmr.2017.262 | [XP] - PRASADH RAMACHANDRAN ET AL, "Room temperature densified ceramics for weight optimized circular polarized GPS antenna design", MICROWAVE AND OPTICAL TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, US, (20180308), vol. 60, no. 4, doi:10.1002/mop.31105, ISSN 0895-2477, pages 1061 - 1066, XP055505131 [XP] 12,14,16,17 * 3 Experimental Procedure * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mop.31105 | [IP] - INDUJA I J ET AL, "Microwave dielectric properties of cold sintered Al2O3-NaCl composite", MATERIALS LETTERS, (20170924), vol. 211, doi:10.1016/J.MATLET.2017.09.083, ISSN 0167-577X, pages 55 - 57, XP085274094 [IP] 12-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matlet.2017.09.083 |