Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020046270 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11849310 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2023 | B2 | US2023058400 | 23.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 | US202218045662 | 11.10.2022 | US201916325663 | 14.02.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11510163 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2022 | B2 | US2021385771 | 09.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102500780B | Global Dossier | 16.02.2023 | B1 | KR20220049608 | 21.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 | KR20207033523 | 27.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102386807B | Global Dossier | 14.04.2022 | B1 | KR20210002600 | 08.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7386952B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2023 | B2 | JP2022185028 | 13.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2022154884 | 28.09.2022 | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 | JP2020566619 | 27.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7150882B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2022 | B2 | JP2021535635 | 16.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116669169 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 | CN201880093652 | 27.08.2018 | CN202310728835 | 27.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112154696B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2023 | B | CN112154696 | 29.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3845012 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US48192 | 27.08.2018 |