EP3845012 - SYNCHRONIZED RECEPTION IN MESH NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUI, Jonathan Wing-Yan 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
TURON, Martin A. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 18766476.8 | 27.08.2018 | [2021/27] | WO2018US48192 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020046270 | Date: | 05.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3845012 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
H04W56/0015 (EP,KR,US);
H04W56/0005 (CN);
H04L43/10 (KR,US);
H04W52/0235 (CN);
H04W52/0248 (CN);
H04W84/18 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISIERTER EMPFANG IN MESH-NETZWERKEN | [2021/27] | English: | SYNCHRONIZED RECEPTION IN MESH NETWORKS | [2021/27] | French: | RÉCEPTION SYNCHRONISÉE DANS DES RÉSEAUX MAILLÉS | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 26.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2494660 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-20 * page 3, line 1 - page 16, line 26 ** figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2015092640 (MANDIGANAL SANTOSH MALLIKARJUNA [IN], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0032] *; | [X]US2016227499 (HO JIN-MENG [US]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] * * figures 7-10 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0132] *; | [XI]US2016374043 (WETTERWALD PATRICK [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-13,15,16,18-20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0010] - [0048] * [I] 4,7,14,17 |