EP3595665 - DUAL MAGL AND FAAH INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lundbeck La Jolla Research Center, Inc. 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington, New Castle County, DE 19808 / US | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Abide Therapeutics, Inc. 10835 Road to the Cure, Suite 250 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRICE, Cheryl A. 10835 Road to the Cure Suite 250 San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
CISAR, Justin S. 10835 Road to the Cure Suite 250 San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
DUNCAN, Katharine K. 10835 Road to the Cure Suite 250 San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
FENG, Yu 10835 Road to the Cure Suite 250 San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
WIENER, John J. M. 10835 Road to the Cure Suite 250 San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
WEBER, Olivia D. 10835 Road to the Cure Suite 250 San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18768237.2 | 12.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018US22049 | Priority number, date | US201762470830P | 13.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762470830 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018169880 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595665 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3595665 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/497, C07D295/205, C07D401/02, C07D471/10 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K31/444 (IL,KR);
A61K31/4545 (IL);
A61K31/501 (IL);
A61K31/506 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (CN);
A61P25/04 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (CN);
C07D213/65 (CN);
C07D213/73 (CN);
C07D213/75 (CN,IL,KR);
C07D213/82 (CN,IL,KR);
C07D213/85 (CN,IL,KR);
C07D401/14 (CN,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELTE MAGL- UND FAAH-INHIBITOREN | [2020/04] | English: | DUAL MAGL AND FAAH INHIBITORS | [2020/04] | French: | INHIBITEURS DOUBLES DE MAGL ET DE FAAH | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23214453.5 / EP4335848 | EP24190031.5 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004111004 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [A]WO2015116774 (SYNTA PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US]); | [AD]WO2016014975 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN [US]) | International search | [X]US2010009971 (ISHII TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US7915251 (KAHN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2016272602 (CISAR JUSTIN S [US], et al); | by applicant | US2010009971 |