12.06.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.04.2024 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.12.2023 |
First examination report |
|
27.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.07.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
03.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
03.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
29.05.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] |
03.01.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] |
04.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
05.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|