Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11833371 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2023 | B2 | US2022023667 | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US24216 | 24.03.2018 | US201916496982 | 24.09.2019 | US201762476287 | 24.03.2017 | US202117341076 | 07.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11033760 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2021 | B2 | US2020094078 | 26.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US24216 | 24.03.2018 | US201762476287 | 24.03.2017 | US201816496982 | 24.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115068843B | Global Dossier | 11.06.2024 | B | CN115068843 | 20.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US24216 | 24.03.2018 | CN201880032270 | 24.03.2018 | CN202210685113 | 24.03.2018 | US201762476287 | 24.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110650778 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US24216 | 24.03.2018 | US201762476287 | 24.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3600549 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2020 | A4 | EP3600549 | 05.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US24216 | 24.03.2018 | US201762476287 | 24.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018176016 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762476287 | 24.03.2017 |