EP3600549 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING RADIOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHENG, Ke 10326 Walavista Road Los Angeles CA 90064 / US | 02 /
BOUCHER, Salime M. 1717 Stewart Street Santa Monica CA 90404 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18771417.5 | 24.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US24216 | Priority number, date | US201762476287P | 24.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762476287 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018176016 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3600549 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, A61N5/00 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
A61N5/1083 (EP,US);
A61N5/103 (EP,CN);
A61N5/1031 (US);
A61N2005/0626 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON STRAHLENTHERAPIE | [2020/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING RADIOTHERAPY | [2020/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE RADIOTHÉRAPIE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 03.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006034973 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [X]US2007071168 (ALLISON JOHN [US], et al); | [X]US2010104068 (KILBY WARREN D [GB], et al) | International search | [A]US2005281389 (KUSCH JOCHEN K [US], et al); | [Y]US2007230660 (HERRMANN KLAUS [DE]); | [Y]WO2016140955 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) | by applicant | US2007071168 | US2010104068 |