20.09.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2023 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
03.07.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.05.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
27.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2023 |
First examination report |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.05.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
30.04.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
30.04.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
15.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
30.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
29.05.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
29.05.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
17.01.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
17.01.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
09.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
25.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2019 |
New entry: Biological material |
|
23.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|