Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018183383 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | US201762570919 | 11.10.2017 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024240139 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418624758 | 02.04.2024 | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | US201916498937 | 27.09.2019 | US202217853570 | 29.06.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023133398 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | US201916498937 | 27.09.2019 | US202217853570 | 29.06.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021085752 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816498901 | 27.03.2018 | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | US201762570919 | 11.10.2017 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | WO2018US24642 | 27.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11920125 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | B2 | US2021106011 | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | US201816498937 | 27.03.2018 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7222032B | Global Dossier | 14.02.2023 | B2 | JP2021165282 | 14.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | JP2019553033 | 27.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7084414B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2022 | B2 | JP2020515569 | 28.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4293129 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2024 | A3 | EP4293129 | 20.12.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | EP18775154 | 27.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3600554 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2021 | A4 | EP3600554 | 05.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | US201762570919 | 11.10.2017 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | WO2018US24642 | 27.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3168036 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA3057972 | 27.03.2018 | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3057972 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2024201475 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2024201475 | 06.03.2024 | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | AU2018246232 | 27.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022204835 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | AU2022204835 | 06.07.2022 | AU2018246232 | 27.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018246232B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2023 | B2 | AU2018246232 | 17.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3609332 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | A4 | EP3609332 | 19.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR111263 | 19.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR127173 | 27.12.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US202062597796 | 12.12.2020 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019020151 | 05.05.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | WO2018US24638 | 27.03.2018 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018183381 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762597796 | 12.12.2017 | US201762477297 | 27.03.2017 | Type | Divisional application | EP4293129 |