EP3616008 - TINTABLE WINDOW SYSTEM COMPUTING PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states View, Inc. 195 South Milpitas Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRIKHA, Nitesh 2731 Huff Drive Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Stephen Clark 131 12th Avenue San Mateo, California 94402 / US | 03 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Dhairya 1232 Golden Way Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 04 /
ROZBICKI, Robert T. 19670 Santa Cruz Highway Los Gatos, California 95033 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18791268.8 | 25.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018US29406 | Priority number, date | US201762490457P | 26.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762490457 P | US201762506514P | 15.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762506514 P | US201762507704P | 17.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762507704 P | US201762523606P | 22.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762523606 P | US201762607618P | 19.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762607618 P | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018200702 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616008 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/163, G02F1/15, // B32B27/34, B32B27/06, B32B27/08, G05B15/02, B32B7/12, B32B27/36, B32B17/10, B32B27/30, B32B3/08, B32B7/022, B32B7/05 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
G02F1/163 (EP,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP);
B32B17/10055 (EP);
B32B17/10302 (EP);
B32B17/10513 (EP,US);
B32B27/06 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B3/08 (EP);
B32B7/022 (EP);
B32B7/05 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
E06B9/24 (EP,US);
G02F1/1347 (EP);
G02F1/15 (EP,US);
G02F1/155 (US);
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
G05B19/042 (US);
G05B19/0426 (US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/044 (US);
G06F3/1446 (US);
G09F19/227 (EP,US);
G09G3/38 (US);
H02J50/20 (US);
H02J50/80 (US);
H10K50/80 (US);
H10K59/65 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/20 (EP);
B32B2255/28 (EP);
B32B2307/102 (EP);
B32B2307/206 (EP);
B32B2307/304 (EP);
B32B2307/402 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/414 (EP);
B32B2307/516 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (EP);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/712 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/754 (EP);
B32B2419/00 (EP,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP);
B32B2457/202 (EP);
E06B2009/2417 (US);
E06B2009/2464 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25011 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25252 (US);
G05B2219/2614 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2628 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2642 (EP,US);
G09G2300/02 (US);
G09G2300/023 (US);
G09G2300/026 (US);
G09G2300/04 (US);
G09G2370/02 (US);
G09G2370/06 (US);
G09G2370/16 (US);
G09G3/3433 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | G05B15/02, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | RECHENPLATTFORM FÜR TÖNBARES FENSTERSYSTEM | [2020/10] | English: | TINTABLE WINDOW SYSTEM COMPUTING PLATFORM | [2020/10] | French: | PLATE-FORME INFORMATIQUE DE SYSTÈME DE FENÊTRES POUVANT ÊTRE TEINTES | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 22.08.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2015134789 (VIEW INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0069] *[A] 2-4,6-15; | [XA]US2016109778 (SHRIVASTAVA DHAIRYA [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0073] * [A] 2-4,6-15; | [X]EP2837205 (VIEW INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1B * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0054] * | International search | [A]KR101346862B (LEE JAE HWA [KR]) [A] 1-31* See paragraphs [0029]-[0038]; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20140004175 (SAGE ELECTROCHROMICS INC [US]) [A] 1-31 * See paragraphs [0045] [0048] and figures 4, 5a-5d, 6, 7a-7e. *; | [Y]US2014236323 (BROWN STEPHEN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-31 * See paragraphs [0081]-[0082]; and figure 4. *; | [Y]US2015116811 (SHRIVASTAVA DHAIRYA [US], et al) [Y] 1-31 * See paragraphs [0006], [0046]-[0048], [0111]-[0115], [0145]; claims 1, 7, 15; and figures 1A-1B, 5A. *; | [A]WO2017007841 (VIEW INC [US]) [A] 1-31 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0048], [0050]-[0051]; and figures 2-5. * |