Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.08.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
12.08.2022 | First examination report | |
29.04.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.04.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.11.2020 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.11.2020 | Change - classification | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.11.2020 | Change - classification | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
03.07.2020 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
03.07.2020 | Change - extension states | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
08.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.04.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.01.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
31.01.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
06.01.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.11.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.10.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.10.2019 | Change - representative | |
29.10.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.11.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.11.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication |