EP3625616 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MIXED REALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 W. Sunrise Boulevard Plantation, FL 33322 / US | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOWENGERDT, Brian, T. 217 22nd Ave. E. Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | 02 /
WATSON, Mathew, D. 10439 N.E. 28th Pl. Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 03 /
TINCH, David 520 S. Pierce Street Apt. A1 Laramie, Wyoming 82070 / US | 04 /
YEOH, Ivan, Li Chuen 13431 Thomasville Circle Tampa, Florida 33617 / US | 05 /
MACNAMARA, John, Graham 821 Northwest 73rd Avenue Plantation, Florida 33317 / US | 06 /
EDWIN, Lionel, Ernest 1431 S.W. 82nd Ave. Apt. 1534 Plantation, Florida 33324 / US | 07 /
KLUG, Michael, Anthony 4115 Avenue H Austin, Texas 78751 / US | 08 /
WELCH, William, Hudson 1617 N.E. 3rd Court Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33301 / US | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18803279.1 | 16.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018US32883 | Priority number, date | US201762506841P | 16.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762506841 P | US201762509499P | 22.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762509499 P | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018213388 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625616 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/10, G02B5/18, G02B6/26, G02B26/08, G02B27/42, G06T19/00, G02B27/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
G02B27/0081 (EP,CN,IL);
G06T19/006 (IL,KR,US);
G02B27/0172 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B26/08 (IL,KR,US);
G02B27/0944 (IL,KR,US);
G02B27/0955 (IL,KR,US);
G02B27/0972 (IL,KR,US);
G02B27/10 (IL,US);
G02B27/106 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G02B27/30 (IL,KR,US);
G02B27/42 (IL,KR,US);
G02B5/18 (IL,KR,US);
G02B6/005 (CN,IL);
G02B2006/1215 (IL,KR,US);
G02B2027/0123 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B2027/0178 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | G02B27/10, G02B5/18, G02B6/26, G02B26/08, G02B27/42, G06T19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR GEMISCHTE REALITÄT | [2020/13] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MIXED REALITY | [2020/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS À LA RÉALITÉ MIXTE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 23.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2012176682 (DEJONG CHRISTIAN DEAN [US]); | [XY]US2013329301 (TRAVIS ADRIAN [US]); | [Y]US2014334777 (DUBROCA GUILHEM [FR], et al); | [Y]CN106537219 (MAGIC LEAP INC); | [Y]US2017131545 (WALL R ANDREW [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2011026128 (BAKER IAN ANDREW [GB], et al); | [XY]US2015235471 (SCHOWENGERDT BRIAN T [US]); | [XY]US2015346490 (TEKOLSTE ROBERT D [US], et al); | [A]US2016077338 (ROBBINS STEVEN JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US2016124228 (BAHMANDAR ALI-REZA [US], et al); | [A]US2016178910 (GIUDICELLI SEBASTIEN [FR], et al); | [A]WO2016105285 (KOC UNIVERSITY [TR]); | [A]US2017010466 (KLUG MICHAEL ANTHONY [US], et al); | [A]US2017038579 (YEOH IVAN L [US], et al) | by applicant | US2012176682 | US2013329301 |