Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020107377 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816617340 | 24.05.2018 | US201762511349 | 26.05.2017 | WO2018KR05874 | 24.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110710321 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762511349 | 26.05.2017 | WO2018KR05874 | 24.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3632175 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2021 | A4 | EP3632175 | 08.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762511349 | 26.05.2017 | WO2018KR05874 | 24.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018217021 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762511349 | 26.05.2017 |