EP3632175 - METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT FOR PERFORMING RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jeonggu IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sunyoung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
YI, Seungjune IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18806642.7 | 24.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018KR05874 | Priority number, date | US201762511349P | 26.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762511349 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018217021 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632175 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W74/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
H04W74/085 (EP);
H04W74/0841 (US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W74/006 (US);
H04W4/70 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BENUTZERGERÄT ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHRENS | [2020/15] | English: | METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT FOR PERFORMING RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR PERMETTANT D'EXÉCUTER UNE PROCÉDURE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 10.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/03] | 06.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010142470 (PARK SUNG-JUN [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] *; | [A] - "DRX related timers handling", vol. RAN WG2, no. Anaheim, USA; 20151116 - 20151120, (20151116), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-156766 DRX RELATED TIMERS HANDLING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20151116), XP051040419 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION ; 3GPP TS 36.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20170427), vol. RAN WG2, no. V14.2.1, pages 1 - 106, XP051298198 [A] 1-15 * section 1 * * section 5.1 * * section 5.4.2.2 * | International search | [Y]US2010238859 (VUKOVIC IVAN N [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 9-12 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0019], [0023], [0025], [0035], [0041]; and figure 2. *; | [Y]US2016219624 (LIN SHIANG-JIUN [TW], et al) [Y] 2-3, 10-11 * See paragraph [0028]; and claims 1, 6. *; | [YA]US2016295437 (ZHANG XIANGDONG [CN]) [Y] 1-4, 9-12 * See paragraphs [0005], [0070]-[0071]; and claims 17, 20, 21. * [A] 5-8, 13-16; | [A]EP2136599 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0043]-[0065]; and claim 1. *; | [A] - FATEMAH ALSEWAIDI et al., "Analysis of radio access network performance for M2M communications in LTE-A at 800 MHz", IEEE Wireless Communications and Networking Conference Workshops (WCNCW, (20140406), pages 110 - 115, XP032668355 [A] 1-16 * See sections II-VI. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNCW.2014.6934870 |