Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11114258 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2021 | B2 | US2020365347 | 19.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP81941 | 20.11.2018 | DE102017127886 | 24.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111492452B | Global Dossier | 15.11.2022 | B | CN111492452 | 04.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP81941 | 20.11.2018 | DE102017127886 | 24.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3714474 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2024 | B1 | EP3714474 | 30.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP81941 | 20.11.2018 | DE102017127886 | 24.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019101744 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017127886 | 24.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017127886 | 29.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017127886 | 24.11.2017 |