Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.06.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.06.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.08.2021 | Change - representative | |
30.06.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.03.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
19.03.2021 | Change - classification | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
19.03.2021 | Change - classification | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
04.09.2020 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
04.09.2020 | Change - extension states | published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
24.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.06.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.04.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
03.04.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
11.03.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.01.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.12.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.12.2019 | Change - representative | |
07.12.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication |