Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10793841 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2020 | B2 | US2019002851 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816012478 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200023455 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US38288 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023159437 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US38288 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | JP2019571591 | 19.06.2018 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020530266 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US38288 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL271553 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US38288 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111032863 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US38288 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3066642 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US38288 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018292105 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US38288 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3645711 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2021 | A4 | EP3645711 | 06.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US38288 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2020103726 | 07.04.2022 | A3 | RU2020103726 | 30.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US38288 | 19.06.2018 | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019005540 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762528846 | 05.07.2017 | US201762527764 | 30.06.2017 |