Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020329700 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP86163 | 20.12.2018 | GB201721824 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7408099B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2024 | B2 | JP2021506912 | 22.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP86163 | 20.12.2018 | GB201721824 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111479465 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP86163 | 20.12.2018 | GB201721824 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3726984 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP86163 | 20.12.2018 | GB201721824 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019122106 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2019 | A3 | WO2019122106 | 27.06.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201721824 | 22.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201721824D0 | 07.02.2018 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201721824 | 22.12.2017 |